Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3508 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34158 Week
» 132803 Month
» 335467 Year
» 3362320 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7703
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94 |
Firebox Type |
Round Top |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2543 |
MELTON |
28/06/1924 |
A1 |
4477 |
GAY CRUSADER |
30/11/1929 |
A1 |
2550 |
BLINK BONNY |
25/05/1934 |
A1 |
2545 |
DIAMOND JUBILEE |
23/07/1936 |
|