Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3347 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29381 Week
» 128026 Month
» 330690 Year
» 3357543 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8080
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94HP |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
2748 |
COLORADO |
20/12/1928 |
A3 |
4480 |
ENTERPRISE |
05/04/1933 |
A3 |
2580 |
SHOTOVER |
06/12/1934 |
A3 |
2747 |
CORONACH |
26/06/1936 |
A3 |
2745 |
CAPTAIN CUTTLE |
06/04/1945 |
A3 |
60109 |
HERMIT |
02/05/1948 |
A3 |
60101 |
CICERO |
02/12/1949 |
|