Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4989 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35639 Week
» 134284 Month
» 336948 Year
» 3363801 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7776
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94 |
Firebox Type |
Round Top |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2558 |
TRACERY |
25/03/1925 |
A1 |
2559 |
THE TETRARCH |
21/04/1928 |
A1 |
2556 |
ORMONDE |
06/11/1930 |
A1 |
2546 |
DONOVAN |
25/10/1934 |
A1 |
4479 |
ROBERT THE DEVIL |
19/10/1940 |
|