Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3431 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29465 Week
» 128110 Month
» 330774 Year
» 3357627 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8225/27037
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94HP |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
2597 |
GAINSBOROUGH |
07/04/1930 |
A3 |
2748 |
COLORADO |
01/09/1934 |
A3 |
2748 |
COLORADO |
12/08/1939 |
A3 |
60065 |
KNIGHT OF THISTLE |
23/07/1948 |
A3 |
60063 |
ISINGLASS |
21/07/1954 |
|