Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4997 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35647 Week
» 134292 Month
» 336956 Year
» 3363809 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #27079
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
60072 |
SUNSTAR |
05/06/1952 |
A3 |
60075 |
ST FRUSQUIN |
28/04/1954 |
A3 |
60097 |
HUMORIST |
31/01/1956 |
A3 |
60040 |
CAMERONIAN |
04/10/1957 |
A3 |
60092 |
FAIRWAY |
13/11/1959 |
A3 |
60080 |
DICK TURPIN |
03/11/1961 |
|