Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1106 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31756 Week
» 130401 Month
» 333065 Year
» 3359918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #10541/27072
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A3 |
60037 |
HYPERION |
22/06/1950 |
A3 |
60096 |
PAPYRUS |
12/11/1953 |
A3 |
60084 |
TRIGO |
27/05/1955 |
A3 |
60077 |
THE WHITE KNIGHT |
30/11/1956 |
A3 |
60089 |
FELSTEAD |
21/05/1958 |
A3 |
60044 |
MELTON |
21/10/1959 |
|