Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2077 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11021 Week
» 2077 Month
» 348501 Year
» 3375354 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1095
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
5332 |
|
05/1932 |
O4 |
6249 |
|
12/03/1938 |
O4 |
6636 |
|
02/05/1942 |
O4 |
6506 |
|
02/09/1944 |
O4 |
3728 |
|
15/02/1947 |
|