Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1107 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1107 Week
» 135923 Month
» 338587 Year
» 3365440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #9672/29852
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60126 |
|
27/04/1949 |
A1 |
60123 |
H.A. IVATT |
17/12/1952 |
A2 |
60502 |
EARL MARISCHAL |
08/10/1954 |
A2 |
60520 |
OWEN TUDOR |
23/02/1957 |
A2 |
60531 |
BAHRAM |
02/04/1959 |
A2 |
60534 |
IRISH ELEGANCE |
21/02/1961 |
|