Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 868 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31518 Week
» 130163 Month
» 332827 Year
» 3359680 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3956/29813
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60147 |
|
13/04/1949 |
A1 |
60118 |
ARCHIBALD STURROCK |
31/07/1953 |
A1 |
60140 |
BALMORAL |
25/11/1955 |
A1 |
60150 |
WILLBROOK |
06/03/1958 |
A1 |
60122 |
CURLEW |
23/10/1959 |
A1 |
60162 |
SAINT JOHNSTOUN |
16/11/1961 |
|