Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2267 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32917 Week
» 131562 Month
» 334226 Year
» 3361079 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29417
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
60850 |
|
03/10/1952 |
A2 |
60508 |
DUKE OF ROTHESAY |
16/02/1957 |
A2 |
60510 |
ROBERT THE BRUCE |
24/07/1959 |
V2 |
60971 |
|
31/08/1961 |
|