Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1923 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27957 Week
» 126602 Month
» 329266 Year
» 3356119 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3728/29788
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
117 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A2 |
519 |
HONEYWAY |
01/02/1947 |
A2 |
60522 |
STRAIGHT DEAL |
09/06/1954 |
A2 |
60500 |
EDWARD THOMPSON |
10/04/1958 |
A2 |
60528 |
TUDOR MINSTREL |
13/04/1960 |
|