Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31686 Week
» 130331 Month
» 332995 Year
» 3359848 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29512
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
60977 |
|
15/12/1951 |
V2 |
60883 |
|
01/04/1954 |
V2 |
819 |
|
07/09/1956 |
V2 |
60819 |
|
07/09/1956 |
V2 |
60842 |
|
12/06/1958 |
V2 |
60836 |
|
06/10/1960 |
V2 |
60923 |
|
08/02/1964 |
|