Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4895 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35545 Week
» 134190 Month
» 336854 Year
» 3363707 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29433
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
109 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
V2 |
60859 |
|
07/02/1951 |
V2 |
60841 |
|
29/05/1953 |
V2 |
60921 |
|
21/05/1955 |
V2 |
60847 |
ST. PETER'S SCHOOL |
12/04/1958 |
V2 |
60948 |
|
22/12/1961 |
|