Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 461 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5448 Week
» 13563 Month
» 141006 Year
» 1806382 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #576
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5468   14/11/1931
B7 5478   06/05/1933
B19 5427   21/03/1936
B7 5038   20/08/1938
B7 5031   07/09/1940
B7 5477   02/10/1943