Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1934 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7087 Week
» 141903 Month
» 344567 Year
» 3371420 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8949
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
107 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A4 |
4486 |
MERLIN |
13/03/1937 |
A4 |
4483 |
KINGFISHER |
06/11/1941 |
A4 |
4463 |
SPARROWHAWK |
22/08/1943 |
A4 |
60033 |
SEAGULL |
06/05/1949 |
|