Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1676 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12891 Week
» 3947 Month
» 350371 Year
» 3377224 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2809
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
13/10/1942 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
31/10/1942 |
Castle |
5059 |
EARL ST ALDWYN |
20/11/1944 |
Castle |
5057 |
EARL WALDEGRAVE |
22/01/1946 |
Castle |
5012 |
BERRY POMEROY CASTLE |
18/12/1957 |
|