Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31686 Week
» 130331 Month
» 332995 Year
» 3359848 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5324
Type |
LNER Corridor |
Company |
LNER |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
9t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
62t 8cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
4476 |
ROYAL LANCER |
05/04/1928 |
A1 |
4472 |
FLYING SCOTSMAN |
08/06/1929 |
A4 |
4485 |
KESTREL |
20/02/1937 |
A4 |
4498 |
SIR NIGEL GRESLEY |
08/08/1943 |
|