Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3800 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29834 Week
» 128479 Month
» 331143 Year
» 3357996 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5327
Type |
LNER Corridor |
Company |
LNER |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
9t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
62t 8cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2547 |
DONCASTER |
26/04/1928 |
A1 |
2546 |
DONOVAN |
02/05/1928 |
A1 |
2547 |
DONCASTER |
06/05/1928 |
A1 |
4474 |
VICTOR WILD |
10/07/1933 |
A3 |
2750 |
PAPYRUS |
24/08/1934 |
A4 |
4484 |
FALCON |
23/01/1937 |
A4 |
4487 |
SEA EAGLE |
04/10/1945 |
A4 |
60030 |
GOLDEN FLEECE |
30/06/1951 |
|