Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4106 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30140 Week
» 128785 Month
» 331449 Year
» 3358302 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5329
Type |
LNER Corridor |
Company |
LNER |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
9t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
62t 8cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2556 |
ORMONDE |
26/05/1928 |
A1 |
2552 |
SANSOVINO |
07/06/1928 |
A1 |
4475 |
FLYING FOX |
10/08/1928 |
A1 |
4474 |
VICTOR WILD |
04/09/1934 |
A1 |
4475 |
FLYING FOX |
15/09/1934 |
A1 |
4476 |
ROYAL LANCER |
27/06/1935 |
A3 |
2750 |
PAPYRUS |
30/06/1937 |
A4 |
4498 |
SIR NIGEL GRESLEY |
30/10/1937 |
A4 |
4485 |
KESTREL |
08/08/1943 |
A4 |
60032 |
GANNET |
24/10/1952 |
A4 |
60026 |
MILES BEEVOR |
01/06/1953 |
A4 |
60003 |
ANDREW K McCOSH |
20/01/1954 |
A4 |
60032 |
GANNET |
07/09/1955 |
A4 |
60024 |
KINGFISHER |
22/03/1957 |
A4 |
60034 |
LORD FARINGDON |
24/08/1966 |
|