Database Search
Searching the database for objects matching '2516'Steam Locomotive: '2516'
Built For | Designer | Works Num | Power | Class | Wheels | Intro. | Built | Withdrawn | Number Type | Number | Number Start | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GWR | Dean | 1557 | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 1883 | 03/1897 | 28/05/1956 | GWR | 2516 | 03/1897 | ||
GWR | Churchward | 2516 | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 1911 | 06/1913 | 09/1937 | GWR (Orig) | 4321 | 06/1913 | ||
SR | Billinton | Radials | 0-6-2T | 1897 | 04/1901 | 15/10/1955 | SR (1931) BR |
2516 32516 |
04/1901 05/1948 |
|||
WD | 25163 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 03/10/1965 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) LNER (1946) BR (1st BR) BR |
821 70821 3051 63051 90051 |
04/1944 01/1945 16/02/1947 03/04/1948 04/1949 |
|||
WD | 25164 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 05/03/1964 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) LNER (1946) BR (1st BR) BR |
822 70822 3052 63052 90052 |
04/1944 01/1945 16/02/1947 15/05/1948 04/1950 |
|||
WD | 25165 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 04/07/1965 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) LNER (1946) BR (1st BR) BR |
823 70823 3053 63053 90053 |
04/1944 01/1945 02/1947 19/06/1948 05/1949 |
|||
WD | 25166 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 21/01/1967 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) LNER (1946) BR (1st BR) BR |
824 70824 3054 63054 90054 |
04/1944 01/1945 02/1947 1948 05/1949 |
|||
WD | 25167 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 04/1944 | 16/07/1962 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) BR |
825 70825 90320 |
04/1944 01/1945 04/1949 |
|||
WD | 25168 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 05/1944 | 14/03/1965 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) LNER (1946) BR (1st BR) BR |
826 70826 3055 63055 90055 |
05/1944 01/1945 04/02/1947 27/03/1948 06/1951 |
|||
WD | 25169 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 05/1944 | 03/05/1967 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) LNER (1946) BR (1st BR) BR |
827 70827 3056 63056 90056 |
05/1944 01/1945 16/02/1947 1948 11/1949 |
|||
WD | 25160 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 02/1944 | 24/06/1967 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) BR |
7433 77433 90300 |
02/1944 01/1945 05/1949 |
|||
WD | 25161 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 02/1944 | 26/09/1965 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) BR |
7434 77434 90301 |
02/1944 01/1945 05/1949 |
|||
WD | 25162 | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 1943 | 02/1944 | 31/12/1966 | WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) LNER (1946) BR (1st BR) BR |
7435 77435 3041 63041 90041 |
02/1944 01/1945 02/1947 11/12/1948 04/1949 |
|||
LSWR | Adams | 2516 | 1P | Radial Tanks | 4-4-2T | 1882 | 12/1883 | 09/1924 | LSWR LSWR (Dup) |
55 055 |
12/1883 11/1905 |
|
LNWR | Webb | 2516 | 4ft 6 Tank | 2-4-2T | 1879 | 1882 | 08/1910 | LNWR | 621 | 1882 | ||
LNWR | Webb | 2717 | 4ft 6 Tank | 2-4-2T | 1879 | 05/1884 | 1919 | LNWR | 2516 | 05/1884 | ||
MR | 5042 | Schenectady 2-6-0 | 2-6-0 | 1899 | 1899 | 07/1914 | MR MR (1907) |
2516 2235 |
1899 1907 |
|||
LMS | Stanier | 4P | 2-6-4T | 1934 | 09/08/1934 | 18/06/1962 | LMS BR |
2516 42516 |
09/08/1934 15/05/1948 |
|||
LNWR | Cooke | 5501 | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 1911 | 11/1919 | 05/1935 | LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) |
2516 5754 25754 |
11/1919 01/1928 06/1934 |
DALTON | |
GER | Holden | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1900 | 05/1901 | 18/08/1957 | GER LNER (1924) LNER (1942) LNER (1946) BR |
1885 8885 7755 2516 62516 |
05/1901 1924 1942 06/1946 02/1949 |
|||
HBR | Stirling | 4558 | J23 | 0-6-0 | 1889 | 03/1908 | 07/1935 | HBR NER LNER (1924) |
135 3135 2516 |
03/1908 1922 05/1924 |
||
USA | 8333 | USA | 2-8-0 | 1942 | 1943 | 2516 | 1943 |
Diesel Locomotive: '2516'
Built For | Builder | Works Num | Type | Class | Wheels | Intro. | Built | Withdrawn | Number Type | Number | Number Start | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BR | Hudswell Clarke | D1207 | Shunter | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | 1956 | 10/11/1961 | 05/08/1967 | BR (Pre Tops) | D2516 | 10/11/1961 | |
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 10/11/1964 | 10/10/1982 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7510 25160 |
10/11/1964 04/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 17/11/1964 | 28/11/1984 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7511 25161 |
17/11/1964 04/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 20/11/1964 | 31/05/1981 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7512 25162 |
20/11/1964 04/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 25/11/1964 | 09/11/1980 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7513 25163 |
25/11/1964 03/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 25/11/1964 | 21/08/1983 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7514 25164 |
25/11/1964 04/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 02/12/1964 | 03/11/1978 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7515 25165 |
02/12/1964 04/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 04/12/1964 | 02/11/1980 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7516 25166 |
04/12/1964 04/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 09/12/1964 | 29/05/1983 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7517 25167 |
09/12/1964 02/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 12/12/1964 | 22/05/1983 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7518 25168 |
12/12/1964 03/1974 |
||
BR | Derby Works | Type2 | 25 | Bo-Bo | 1961 | 06/01/1965 | 08/09/1981 | BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) |
D7519 25169 |
06/01/1965 11/09/1973 |
33 matches