01 0-4-0
BR (1955 Num) | BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | BR (Dept) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11503 | D2953 | 24/01/1956 | 30A W |
Stratford (New) Withdrawn |
24/01/1956 19/06/1966 |
19/06/1966 | ||
11504 | D2954 | 01001 | 19/02/1956 | 30A 9D 6J W |
Stratford (New) Newton Heath Holyhead Withdrawn |
19/02/1956 01/05/1965 10/06/1967 14/09/1979 |
14/09/1979 | |
11505 | D2955 | 01002 | 19/02/1956 | 30A 9D 6J W |
Stratford (New) Newton Heath Holyhead Withdrawn |
19/02/1956 01/05/1965 10/06/1967 15/03/1981 |
15/03/1981 | |
11506 | D2956 | 30/03/1956 | 30A 9D 36A W |
Stratford (New) Newton Heath Doncaster Withdrawn |
30/03/1956 01/05/1965 05/02/1966 29/05/1966 |
29/05/1966 | ||
D2956 | 81 | 01/01/1958 | 36A W |
Doncaster Withdrawn |
08/07/1967 01/11/1967 |
01/11/1967 |