37 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (37/0) | BR (37/5) | BR (37/7) | BR (37/4) | BR (37/3 (1)) | BR (37/9M) | BR (37/9R) | BR (37/3 (2)) | BR (37/0 (R)) | BR (37/6) | BR (37/0 (R2)) | BR (Dept) | BR (37/4 (R)) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6726 | 37026 | 37320 | 37026 | 08/09/1961 | EE | Stratford | 28/01/1999 | 37.33 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 07/2000 | 38.88 | ||||||||||||
D6737 | 37037 | 37321 | 37037 | 04/05/1962 | EE | Hull Dairycoates | 01/08/2000 | 38.25 | Prs | Preserved | 62.02 | |||||||||||||
D6749 | 37049 | 37322 | 37343 | 37049 | 17/08/1962 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 01/02/1995 | 32.5 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) | 12/2003 | 41.36 | |||||||||||
D6788 | 37088 | 37323 | 37088 | 14/01/1963 | EE | Gateshead | 30/09/2002 | 39.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/10/2002 | 39.75 | ||||||||||||
D6799 | 37099 | 37324 | 37099 | 14/12/1962 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 17/06/1997 | 34.5 | Prs | Preserved | 61.41 | |||||||||||||
D6808 | 37108 | 37325 | 37108 | 25/01/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 01/09/1996 | 33.67 | Prs | Preserved | 61.30 | |||||||||||||
D6811 | 37111 | 37326 | 37111 | 08/02/1963 | EE | Sheffield Darnall | 18/09/1998 | 35.58 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 03/07/2003 | 40.42 | ||||||||||||
D6837 | 37137 | 37312 | 37137 | 24/04/1963 | EE | Landore | 31/05/2006 | 43.08 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 07/2006 | 43.25 | ||||||||||||
D6845 | 37145 | 37313 | 37382 | 37145 | 06/06/1963 | EE | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1994 | 30.58 | Cut | Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) | 04/2000 | 36.88 | |||||||||||
D6852 | 37152 | 37310 | 37152 | 08/07/1963 | EE | Landore | 01/12/1999 | 36.42 | Prs | Preserved | 60.85 | |||||||||||||
D6856 | 37156 | 37311 | 37156 | 25/07/1963 | EE | Landore | 01/06/1999 | 35.92 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 01/2000 | 36.50 | ||||||||||||
D6890 | 37190 | 37314 | 37190 | 21/01/1964 | EE | Landore | 01/07/1993 | 29.5 | Prs | Preserved | 60.31 |