Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 2568 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 13783 Week
» 4839 Month
» 351263 Year
» 3378116 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
46 1Co-Co1
Class |
BR (Pre Tops) |
BR (Tops) |
BR (97/4) |
BR (Dept) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
46 |
D138
|
46001
|
|
|
21/10/1961 |
20/12/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
31/12/1971 |
46 |
D139
|
46002
|
|
|
03/11/1961 |
20/09/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/1972 |
46 |
D140
|
46003
|
|
|
25/11/1961 |
05/10/1978 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/1973 |
46 |
D141
|
46004
|
|
|
17/11/1961 |
26/06/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
06/11/1971 |
46 |
D142
|
46005
|
|
|
05/12/1961 |
04/12/1977 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/04/1972 |
46 |
D143
|
46006
|
|
|
01/12/1961 |
31/01/1982 |
Air Brakes fitted |
29/05/1971 |
46 |
D144
|
46007
|
|
|
09/12/1961 |
07/02/1982 |
Air Brakes fitted |
09/1972 |
46 |
D145
|
46008
|
|
|
09/12/1961 |
11/10/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
15/09/1973 |
46 |
D146
|
46009
|
(97401)
|
|
15/12/1961 |
01/10/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
13/02/1971 |
46 |
D147
|
46010
|
|
|
16/12/1961 |
04/11/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
25/10/1972 |
46 |
D148
|
46011
|
|
|
22/12/1961 |
25/11/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/1972 |
46 |
D149
|
46012
|
|
|
30/12/1961 |
27/07/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/1973 |
46 |
D150
|
46013
|
|
|
30/12/1961 |
01/11/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
31/07/1973 |
46 |
D151
|
46014
|
|
|
17/01/1962 |
06/05/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1973 |
46 |
D152
|
46015
|
|
|
01/02/1962 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/1971 |
46 |
D153
|
46016
|
|
|
25/01/1962 |
31/12/1983 |
Modified headcode box |
08/1976 |
46 |
D154
|
46017
|
|
|
16/02/1962 |
22/04/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/02/1972 |
46 |
D155
|
46018
|
|
|
16/02/1962 |
18/12/1983 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
02/1979 |
46 |
D156
|
46019
|
|
|
23/02/1962 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
29/05/1971 |
46 |
D157
|
46020
|
|
|
03/03/1962 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
31/12/1971 |
46 |
D158
|
46021
|
|
|
15/03/1962 |
16/01/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
07/1972 |
46 |
D159
|
46022
|
|
|
23/03/1962 |
28/03/1982 |
Exceptional headcode modification |
01/1979 |
46 |
D160
|
46023
|
(97402)
|
|
31/03/1962 |
01/11/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/1972 |
46 |
D161
|
46024
|
|
|
31/03/1962 |
16/04/1978 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/1972 |
46 |
D162
|
46025
|
|
|
09/04/1962 |
25/11/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/04/1972 |
46 |
D163
|
46026
|
|
|
18/04/1962 |
25/11/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/07/1972 |
46 |
D165
|
46028
|
|
|
04/05/1962 |
27/05/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
30/12/1972 |
46 |
D166
|
46029
|
|
|
09/05/1962 |
30/01/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/10/1970 |
46 |
D167
|
46030
|
|
|
31/05/1962 |
01/11/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/11/1971 |
46 |
D168
|
46031
|
|
|
31/05/1962 |
24/04/1983 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
08/1976 |
46 |
D169
|
46032
|
|
|
07/06/1962 |
11/10/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/12/1970 |
46 |
D170
|
46033
|
|
|
21/06/1962 |
19/06/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
06/1982 |
46 |
D171
|
46034
|
|
|
06/07/1962 |
02/11/1980 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
03/1978 |
46 |
D172
|
46035
|
|
97403
|
02/07/1962 |
01/11/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
16/10/1970 |
46 |
D173
|
46036
|
|
|
13/07/1962 |
02/05/1982 |
Air Brakes fitted |
16/11/1970 |
46 |
D174
|
46037
|
|
|
13/07/1962 |
24/06/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
07/1971 |
46 |
D175
|
46038
|
|
|
03/08/1962 |
28/03/1982 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/06/1971 |
46 |
D176
|
46039
|
|
|
14/08/1962 |
23/10/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/07/1970 |
46 |
D177
|
46040
|
|
|
24/08/1962 |
26/10/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
08/1976 |
46 |
D179
|
46042
|
|
|
21/09/1962 |
01/11/1981 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
07/1976 |
46 |
D181
|
46044
|
|
|
22/09/1962 |
08/04/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
21/05/1971 |
46 |
D182
|
46045
|
|
97404
|
27/09/1962 |
01/11/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/09/1970 |
46 |
D183
|
46046
|
|
|
04/10/1962 |
06/05/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
31/12/1970 |
46 |
D184
|
46047
|
|
|
15/10/1962 |
02/09/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/03/1971 |
46 |
D185
|
46048
|
|
|
16/10/1962 |
13/09/1981 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
08/1976 |
46 |
D186
|
46049
|
|
|
09/11/1962 |
12/12/1982 |
Air Brakes fitted |
30/10/1970 |
46 |
D187
|
46050
|
|
|
23/11/1962 |
26/10/1982 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/03/1972 |
46 |
D188
|
46051
|
|
|
17/12/1962 |
04/12/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
25/07/1970 |
46 |
D189
|
46052
|
|
|
26/01/1963 |
30/09/1984 |
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
08/1976 |
46 |
D191
|
46054
|
|
|
26/01/1963 |
10/01/1982 |
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
04/1978 |
46 |
D193
|
46056
|
|
|
26/01/1963 |
31/10/1982 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/12/1970 |