GNR/LNER Gresley "K2" Class 2-6-0
Class | GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | BR (BR Tmp) | Built | Date Withdrawn | Modification | Modification Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
K2 | 1631 | 4631 | 1721 | 61721 | 02/1913 | 30/12/1959 | Westinghouse Brake fitted | 12/1927 | |
K2 | 1644 | 4644 | 1734 | 61734 | 04/1914 | 25/07/1956 | Westinghouse Brake fitted | 02/1928 | |
K2 | 1647 | 4647 | 1737 | 61737 | 05/1914 | 22/11/1956 | Westinghouse Brake fitted | 14/09/1927 | |
K2 | 1650 | 4650 | 1740 | 61740 | 01/1916 | 03/01/1961 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 26/03/1955 | |
K2 | 1652 | 4652 | 1742 | 61742 | 05/1916 | 15/05/1962 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 24/07/1955 | |
K2 | 1653 | 4653 | 1743 | 61743 | 06/1916 | 22/06/1959 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 17/12/1955 | |
K2 | 1655 | 4655 | 1745 | 61745 | 10/1916 | 25/11/1960 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 10/1954 | |
K2 | 1656 | 4656 | 1746 | 61746 | 11/1916 | 27/02/1959 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 28/05/1955 | |
K2 | 1662 | 4662 | 1752 | 61752 | 06/1918 | 11/12/1959 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 06/1953 | |
K2 | 1663 | 4663 | 1753 | 61753 | 1753 | 07/1918 | 28/09/1959 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 20/03/1954 |
K2 | 1664 | 4664 | 1754 | 61754 | 07/1918 | 30/12/1959 | Westinghouse Brake fitted | 07/1927 | |
K2 | 1667 | 4667 | 1757 | 61757 | 08/1918 | 24/02/1959 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 23/04/1955 | |
K2 | 1669 | 4669 | 1759 | 61759 | 08/1918 | 01/01/1960 | Westinghouse Brake fitted | 02/1928 | |
K2 | 1671 | 4671 | 1761 | 61761 | 06/1918 | 19/01/1961 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 17/04/1954 | |
K2 | 1674 | 4674 | 1764 | 61764 | 07/1918 | 07/09/1961 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 11/1931 | |
K2 | 1675 | 4675 | 1765 | 61765 | 07/1918 | 01/05/1958 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 09/1955 | |
K2 | 1676 | 4676 | 1766 | 61766 | 1766 | 08/1918 | 23/01/1961 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 27/11/1954 |
K2 | 1677 | 4677 | 1767 | 61767 | 08/1918 | 06/01/1961 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 01/10/1955 | |
K2 | 1687 | 4687 | 1777 | 61777 | 06/1921 | 11/05/1959 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 08/1955 | |
K2 | 1688 | 4688 | 1778 | 61778 | 07/1921 | 09/10/1959 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 20/10/1956 | |
K2 | 1690 | 4690 | 1780 | 61780 | 07/1921 | 21/10/1959 | Westinghouse Brake removed | 20/08/1955 |