D3/6 0-6-0
LMS | BR (1955 Num) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7074 | 12000 | 04/1936 | 5A 5B W |
Crewe North (New) Crewe South Withdrawn |
04/1936 01/01/1948 29/04/1961 |
29/04/1961 |
7076 | 12001 | 30/09/1936 | 5B W |
Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/02/1962 |
03/02/1962 |
7079 | 12002 | 30/04/1934 | 5B W |
Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 |
16/06/1956 |