Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 66 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30716 Week
» 129361 Month
» 332025 Year
» 3358878 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3852 |
y/e |
1918 |
British Railways |
43852 |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1918 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 04/05/1957 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 18/05/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1918 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3852 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourton (20B) |
|
|
01/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43852 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
04/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43852 |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|