Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 1047 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31697 Week
» 130342 Month
» 333006 Year
» 3359859 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3965 |
y/e |
1921 |
British Railways |
43965 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
To Service |
During y/e 1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/12/1959 |
Service Life |
39 yrs , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1957 |
Stratford On Avon, S. & M.J.R. |
The former SMJ shed has been completely demolished, leaving only the water tower at the rear. It was officially closed as from 22nd July and the duties and men transferred to the W.R. shed (sub 84E). The shed stood at the site of the new spur (on which work has commenced) which will connect the SMJ line southwards to the W.R. line. Stratford lost its code, 21D, and permanent allocation in February, 1953, since when, several engines from various sheds have stabled overnight and been used by Stratford men for their own turns. Two Class 4F's (43965 and 44463) have been transferred on loan to the W.R. and are at the former GWR shed. They were originally intended for Jamboree traffic but are now to be kept for emergency in case of failure of any LMR engine shedded over-night. On 3rd August, LMR locos. at W.R. shed were 43873, 43967 of 15D, 44076, 44491 of 2E and the two already mentioned. The original S. & M.J.R. signal box at entrance to Town station is also to be demolished-it has been unused for many years. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1921 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3965 Built at Armstrong Whitworth |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43965 |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43965 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|