Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1106 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31756 Week
» 130401 Month
» 333065 Year
» 3359918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D113 |
14/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45128 |
01/06/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
14/09/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
22/04/1989 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 03/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with broad white band along lower bodyside between the cab doors. |
14/09/1961 |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
by 31/12/1962 |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
11/09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/09/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
11/09/1971 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
03/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
06/05/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D113 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45128 |
|
|
22/04/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45128 |
|
|
03/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|