Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 1043 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31693 Week
» 130338 Month
» 333002 Year
» 3359855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1835 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
British Railways |
31835 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1924 |
EXJ |
|
Exmouth Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/09/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/09/1961 |
Andover Junction |
Andover Jct shed now has an allocation of two engines-one for the daily freight to Ludgershall (returning through to Basingstoke) and the other for a goods to Southampton Docks and Bournemouth. On 10th September, 31626 an 31835 were on shed, the former having worked through to Cheltenham and back on the 9th September (for the last time). |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1835 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31835 |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31835 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|