Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 422 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21456 Week
» 120101 Month
» 322765 Year
» 3349618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C2 |
m/e |
05/1942 |
British Railways |
33002 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 07/07/1963 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73E |
Faversham |
8w/e |
03/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
3w/e |
27/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
73J |
Tonbridge |
P |
14/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
4w/e |
10/02/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/07/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C2 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33002 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
27/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
07/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33002 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|