Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 130 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 130 Week
» 19031 Month
» 19031 Year
» 1684407 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 125 m/e 07/1916
Great Western Railway 360 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 07/1916
Withdrawal Thu 10/02/1955
Total Mileage 810,893
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 26/03/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1916
   Withdrawn on 10/02/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
WDN   m/e 28/02/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1916 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 125
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 360    
10/02/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 360    

prev prev