Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 44 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4021 Week
» 15258 Month
» 248178 Year
» 1913554 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 42 m/e 08/1915
Great Western Railway 439 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (1947) 312 on 22/09/1949 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 08/1915
Withdrawal Mon 11/06/1956
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys
Total Mileage 881,057

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 03/11/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1915
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/01/1955
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/10/1955
     Withdrawn on 11/06/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/10/1955
WDN   m/e 30/06/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1915 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 42
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 439    
22/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 312    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
11/06/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 312    
03/11/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev