Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1868 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10812 Week
» 1868 Month
» 348292 Year
» 3375145 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1365 |
m/e |
08/1910 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
1361 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
179 |
Works Number |
2379 |
To Service |
During 08/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/11/1962 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1910 |
la |
|
Plymouth Dock |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
LA |
|
Laira |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
82C |
|
Swindon |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/11/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82C |
Swindon |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/08/1958 |
Film Star |
0-6-0ST 1365 was at Oxley shed en route Swindon from Oswestry, where it had been stabled whilst it was engaged in the making of the film 'The Inn of the Sixth Happiness' in North Wales (Wolverhampton Express and Star). |
SLS/195809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1365 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2379 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Dock (la) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Laira (LA) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
20/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1365 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|