Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3517 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30696 Week
» 21752 Month
» 368176 Year
» 3395029 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1706 |
31/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47118 |
20/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
31/12/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/11/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
28/11/1970 |
|
Reclassified from 48 to 47 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
28/11/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1706 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 468 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
22/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 48 to 47 |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47118 |
|
|
18/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/03/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47118 |
|
|
04/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Doncaster MPD |
|
|