Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 33 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30683 Week
» 129328 Month
» 331992 Year
» 3358845 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2007 |
m/e |
10/1892 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1892 |
DID |
|
Didcot |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
WOS |
|
Worcester |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
WOS |
Worcester |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1906 |
Diagram R4 boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/11/1959 |
Brecon demotion |
Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2007 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road), Works Number 549 |
|
|
08/1906 |
Modification |
Diagram R4 boiler fitted |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (DID) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
01/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2007 |
|
|