Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1001 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31651 Week
» 130296 Month
» 332960 Year
» 3359813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2035 |
m/e |
01/1898 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
2021 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
To Service |
During 01/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 18/03/1955 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,112,528 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1915 |
Diagram BR0 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
05/1936 |
Rebuilt with pannier tanks |
05/1936 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/11/1959 |
Brecon demotion |
Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2035 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
|
|
04/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram BR0 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with pannier tanks |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
18/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2035 |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|