Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 624 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 624 Week
» 135440 Month
» 338104 Year
» 3364957 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
26039 |
19/04/1952 |
TOPS (Tops) |
76039 |
16/03/1974 |
TOPS (AB/MU) |
76048 |
30/10/1976 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
76 |
Wheels |
Bo+Bo |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
19/04/1952 |
Withdrawn |
06/02/1977 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1984 |
Cut At |
C F Booth Rotherham |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
19/04/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/02/1977 |
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
19/04/1952 |
vo |
Vacuum braked, No heat |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/04/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 26039 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 76039 |
|
|
30/10/1976 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 76048 |
|
|
06/02/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76048 |
|
|
02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|