Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 617 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 617 Week
» 135433 Month
» 338097 Year
» 3364950 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D29 |
13/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45002 |
01/06/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
13/05/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
16/09/1984 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
on 17/11/1988 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with broad white band along lower bodyside between the cab doors. |
13/05/1961 |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
by 31/12/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D29 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
17/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
01/06/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45002 |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
16/09/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45002 |
|
|
17/11/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|