Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 1806 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28985 Week
» 20041 Month
» 366465 Year
» 3393318 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11508 |
28/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2958 |
19/04/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1956 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11508 Built at Ruston & Hornsby Allocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2958 |
|
|
14/01/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2958 |
|
|
10/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|