Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 76 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30726 Week
» 129371 Month
» 332035 Year
» 3358888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
31 |
m/e |
03/1898 |
British Railways |
30031 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
British Railways (Renum) |
30128 |
m/e |
01/1961 (Probably didn't carry this number) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
M7 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
V7 |
To Service |
During 03/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/01/1961 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
31/07/1950 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
04/06/1955 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
P |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1898 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 31 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30031 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
31/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
01/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30128 |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30128 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|