Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 229 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3261 Week
» 21313 Month
» 254233 Year
» 1919609 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
South Eastern Railway 251 m/e 11/1896
Southern Railway (1923) A251 y/e 1923
Southern Railway (1931) 1251 y/e 1931
British Railways 31258 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Stirling / H. Wainwright
Class O1
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O11/1896
O1 (0-6-0)12/1917
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1896
Withdrawal During 02/1961
Service Life 64 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1896
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C   Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951
74A   Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957
74C   Dover Marine 5w/e 19/07/1957
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 01/11/1955
REINS 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 19/12/1955
ALLOC 74A Ashford q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 19/07/1957
WDN   w/e 28/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1896 To Service To service as South Eastern Railway Number 251
Built at Ashford Works
   
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to A251    
1931 Renumbered Renumbered to 1251    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31258    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
19/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31258    
02/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev