Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1101 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1101 Week
» 135917 Month
» 338581 Year
» 3365434 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13296 |
17/01/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3296 |
30/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08226 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
55B |
|
(New) |
on |
17/01/1957 |
55A |
|
Holbeck (MR) |
4w/e |
09/09/1967 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/11/1985 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/01/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/01/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13296 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3296 |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08226 |
|
|
24/11/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08226 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
05/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|