Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1122 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1122 Week
» 135938 Month
» 338602 Year
» 3365455 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13356 |
21/06/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3356 |
04/04/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08286 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13356 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
04/04/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3356 |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08286 |
|
|
31/12/1980 |
To Store |
|
|
|
25/04/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08286 from Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
01/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by H Ralston: at Polmadie MPD |
|
|