Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1101 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1101 Week
» 135917 Month
» 338581 Year
» 3365434 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3436 |
24/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08366 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3436 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08366 |
|
|
08/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08366 from Margam (MG) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|