Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 679 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 679 Week
» 135495 Month
» 338159 Year
» 3365012 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D401 |
09/12/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50001 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/12/1967 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D401 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3772 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50001 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/04/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/04/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Dreadnought' at Laira |
|
|
19/04/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50001 |
|
|
12/12/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|