Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 475 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 475 Week
» 135291 Month
» 337955 Year
» 3364808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
316 |
m/e |
08/1886 |
Caledonian Railway (1918) |
703 |
y/e |
1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17287 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57287 |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
294 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
St. Rollox Works |
Order Number |
Y5 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 08/1886 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/11/1961 |
Service Life |
75 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1886 |
31D |
|
Grangemouth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/11/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1906 |
Unspecified rebuilding undertaken |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/05/1961 |
Bo\'ness MPD |
In store beyond the station beside the now closed dock-54475/83, 55222, 56169, 56370, 57245/57/64/85/7, 57338/66/73, 57411/26/9/70, 57557/76, 62689, 64471/82, 64515/35, 68325/454. |
SLS/196106 |
18/08/1961 |
Bo\'Ness docks |
Locomotives in store on 18th August were-55222, 57245/57/64/85/7, 57314/38/66/73, 57411/26/9/70/2, 57557/76, 64515/8/35, 68454. |
SLS/196109 |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1886 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 316 Built at St. Rollox Works |
|
|
1906 |
Modification |
Modification: Unspecified rebuilding undertaken |
|
|
1918 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 703 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17287 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57287 |
|
|
27/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57287 |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|