Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1898 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27932 Week
» 126577 Month
» 329241 Year
» 3356094 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4107 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
British Railways |
44107 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1924 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1961 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1924 |
18C |
|
Hasland |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20C |
|
Royston |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
55B |
|
Stourton |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
23/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
27/11/1954 |
ALLOC |
55B |
Stourton |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4107 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hasland (18C) |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44107 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44107 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|