Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3456 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29490 Week
» 128135 Month
» 330799 Year
» 3357652 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4322 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
British Railways |
44322 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
St. Rollox Works |
To Service |
During 01/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1928 |
27F |
|
Ayr |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
29A |
|
Perth South |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63B |
|
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
66A |
|
Polmadie |
4w/e |
05/07/1958 |
66B |
|
Motherwell |
4w/e |
16/06/1962 |
67A |
|
Corkerhill |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1962 |
|
|
<unknown> (Reinstated) |
m/e |
02/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63B |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
ALLOC |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
09/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
6w/e |
18/08/1962 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
4w/e |
10/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
REINS |
67B |
Hurlford |
3w/e |
25/01/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/07/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
In shops-44322/28, 45009, 64572, 64606, 65905. Awaiting shops: 65479. Shopped in previous five weeks-64552/91, 64602/27, 65297. Cut up previous five weeks- 55165/229, 57559, 61996/8, 64542/53, 65296, 68338. Being cut up: 40645/7, 57411, 57557, 64628. Awaiting cut up: 57560, 64566, 64963. 64553 was involved in an accident which resulted in a large 'tear' along the frame and although there was a possibility of repair it was scrapped in the shops. The battery rail-car is back in shops after further trials. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4322 Built at St. Rollox Works |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (27F) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44322 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44322 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Reinstated |
|
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|