Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1109 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31759 Week
» 130404 Month
» 333068 Year
» 3359921 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4440 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
44440 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1927 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1964 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4440 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44440 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44440 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|