Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 261 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21295 Week
» 119940 Month
» 322604 Year
» 3349457 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1089 |
m/e |
06/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12129 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52129 |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
6 |
Works Number |
87 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/09/1961 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1891 |
16A |
|
Nottingham |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
17B |
|
Burton |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
26D |
|
Bury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
02/09/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1915 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1089 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 87 |
|
|
12/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12129 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D) |
|
|
08/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52129 |
|
|
02/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52129 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|